TX SB280 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition and duties of the capital and forensic writs committee.
Title
Relating to the composition and duties of the capital and forensic writs committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1223 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-18 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-18 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-18 | House | Record vote RV#1223 |
2021-05-18 | House | Passed |
2021-05-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-18 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-18 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-18 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-14 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-12 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-07 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-28 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hinojosa |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CAPITAL AND FORENSIC WRITS COMMITTEE
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
INDIGENT DEFENSE COMMISSION, TEXAS
STATE BAR OF TEXAS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
INDIGENT DEFENSE COMMISSION, TEXAS
STATE BAR OF TEXAS