TX SB279 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the inclusion of suicide prevention information on certain student identification cards issued by a public school or public institution of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the inclusion of suicide prevention information on certain student identification cards issued by a public school or public institution of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective immediately
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-29HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-29SenateRead
2021-05-29SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1500
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-26HouseObjections withdrawn
2021-05-26HouseWithdrawn from calendar (contested)
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-23HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-19HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-03HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-05-03HouseRead first time
2021-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-29SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenatePassed
2021-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-29SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-29SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-28SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-22SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2021-01-04SenateFiled
2021-01-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1014 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Referred to Education
HB1754 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Placed on intent calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB279
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00279I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00279S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00279E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00279H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00279F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00279I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00279I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00279S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00279S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00279E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00279H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00279H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00279F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-29-F.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB279&RcdVtNo=1500&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=33

Bill Comments

feedback