TX SB275 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Withdrawn from calendar (by author)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Withdrawn from calendar (by author)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of an entity name that falsely implies governmental affiliation.
Title
Relating to the use of an entity name that falsely implies governmental affiliation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2021-05-26 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-21 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-19 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-28 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hinojosa |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1493 (Same As) 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21