TX SB272 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring the board of trustees of each school district to create a nonvoting student trustee position on the board.
Title
Relating to requiring the board of trustees of each school district to create a nonvoting student trustee position on the board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts