TX SB270 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to civil liability of a nursing facility resident's responsible payor for misappropriation of the resident's funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to civil liability of a nursing facility resident's responsible payor for misappropriation of the resident's funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#350 (Y: 136 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-04-30 Signed by the Governor
2021-04-22 Sent to the Governor
2021-04-22HouseSigned in the House
2021-04-21SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-04-20SenateReported enrolled
2021-04-20SenateHouse passage reported
2021-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-20HouseRecord vote RV#350
2021-04-20HousePassed
2021-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-04-19HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-19HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 1593
2021-04-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-04-06HouseRead first time
2021-03-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-03-25SenateReported engrossed
2021-03-25SenateRecord vote
2021-03-25SenatePassed
2021-03-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-25SenateRecord vote
2021-03-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-03-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-03-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-03-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-24SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-12-29SenateFiled
2020-12-29SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1593 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB270
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00270I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00270S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00270E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00270H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00270F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00270I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00270I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00270E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00270H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-25-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-25-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB270&RcdVtNo=350&Ch=H&Dt=04/20/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback