TX SB269 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of fraudulent use or possession of identifying information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of fraudulent use or possession of identifying information.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2018-12-20SenateFiled
2018-12-20SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2697 (Same As) 2019-05-31 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback