TX SB269 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an exemption for land owned by a school from the additional tax imposed on the change of use of land appraised for ad valorem tax purposes as qualified open-space land.
Title
Relating to an exemption for land owned by a school from the additional tax imposed on the change of use of land appraised for ad valorem tax purposes as qualified open-space land.
Sponsors
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Filed |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
OPEN-SPACE LAND
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
OPEN-SPACE LAND
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB269 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SB00269I.htm |