TX SB269 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to use of electronically readable information on a driver's license or personal identification certificate in connection with the over-the-counter sale of ephedrine, pseudoephedrine, or norpseudoephedrine; providing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to use of electronically readable information on a driver's license or personal identification certificate in connection with the over-the-counter sale of ephedrine, pseudoephedrine, or norpseudoephedrine; providing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Harris [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-24 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-04-06 | Read first time | |
2009-04-02 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Passed | |
2009-04-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-02 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-02 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-02 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-26 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-26 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-02-11 | Read first time | |
2008-11-12 | Filed | |
2008-11-12 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3107 (Same As) 2009-03-18 - Referred to Public Health
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
EPHEDRINE
PSEUDOEPHEDRINE
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Business & Commerce--General
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
EPHEDRINE
PSEUDOEPHEDRINE
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses