TX SB268 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to acceptable forms of identification for voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to acceptable forms of identification for voting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23SenateCo-author authorized
2021-01-26SenateCo-author authorized
2020-12-21SenateFiled
2020-12-21SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB160 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Elections

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback