TX SB268 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the duties of a magistrate to inform an arrested person of consequences of a plea of guilty or nolo contendere.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the duties of a magistrate to inform an arrested person of consequences of a plea of guilty or nolo contendere.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-26HouseRecord vote
2015-05-26HouseFailed to pass to 3rd reading
2015-05-26HouseAmended
2015-05-26HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-05-24HousePostponed
2015-05-24HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-05-23HousePostponed
2015-05-23HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-05-20HousePostponed
2015-05-20HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-05-19HousePostponed
2015-05-19HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-05-18HousePostponed
2015-05-18HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-05-12HousePostponed
2015-05-12HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-12HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2015-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-05-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-29HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2015-04-29HouseRead first time
2015-04-21HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-04-20SenateReported engrossed
2015-04-20SenateRecord vote
2015-04-20SenatePassed
2015-04-20SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-20SenateRecord vote
2015-04-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-04-20SenateRecord vote
2015-04-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2015-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-04-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-04-15SenateCo-author authorized
2015-04-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-04-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-04-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-06SenateReported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
2015-04-06SenateTestimony taken in subcommittee
2015-04-06SenateConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2015-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2015-03-30SenateSubcommittee meeting cancelled
2015-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2015-01-28SenateReferred to s/c on Border Security by Pres
2015-01-28SenateRead first time
2014-12-19SenateFiled
2014-12-19SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback