TX SB268 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the application of the professional prosecutors law to the district attorney for the 287th Judicial District and the county attorney of Oldham County.
Title
Relating to the application of the professional prosecutors law to the district attorney for the 287th Judicial District and the county attorney of Oldham County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - House - SB 268Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-24 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2013-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2013-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | House | Passed |
2013-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2013-04-08 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-14 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Passed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Filed |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |