TX SB266 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-27 - Received from the Senate

Summary

Relating to the review of information technology systems used by a state agency for compatibility with open standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the review of information technology systems used by a state agency for compatibility with open standards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-27 Received from the Senate
2009-05-26 Reported engrossed
2009-05-26 Record vote
2009-05-26 Passed
2009-05-26 Read 3rd time
2009-05-26 Record vote
2009-05-26 Three day rule suspended
2009-05-26 Vote recorded in Journal
2009-05-26 Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2009-05-26 Laid before the Senate
2009-05-26 Placed on local & uncontested calendar
2009-05-18 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-05-18 Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
2009-05-18 Reported favorably as substituted
2009-05-12 Considered in public hearing
2009-05-12 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-05-11 Left pending in committee
2009-05-11 Testimony taken in committee
2009-05-11 Considered in public hearing
2009-05-11 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-02-11 Referred to Government Organization
2009-02-11 Read first time
2008-11-12 Filed
2008-11-12 Received by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback