TX SB263 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Placed on Major State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Placed on Major State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the issuance by the Texas Transportation Commission of general obligation bonds for highway improvement projects.
Title
Relating to the issuance by the Texas Transportation Commission of general obligation bonds for highway improvement projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-23 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-12 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-04-30 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-22 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Passed | |
2009-04-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-22 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-22 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-22 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-22 | Amended | |
2009-04-22 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-22 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-02 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-02 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-02-11 | Read first time | |
2008-11-12 | Filed | |
2008-11-12 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2116 (Same As) 2009-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
BONDS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Highways
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Highways
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS