TX SB258 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-01 - Co-author authorized
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-01 - Co-author authorized
Summary
Relating to a requirement that certain appraisal districts provide for electronic filing of and electronic communications regarding a protest of appraised value by the owner of a residence homestead.
Title
Relating to a requirement that certain appraisal districts provide for electronic filing of and electronic communications regarding a protest of appraised value by the owner of a residence homestead.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-01 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-02 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-02 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-02-11 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed | |
2008-11-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts