TX SB2565 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to adjustments of rates of certain telecommunications utilities for changes in certain tax liabilities.
Title
Relating to adjustments of rates of certain telecommunications utilities for changes in certain tax liabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-22 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-20 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-15 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-05-15 | Read first time | |
2009-05-11 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-11 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-11 | Record vote | |
2009-05-11 | Passed | |
2009-05-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-11 | Record vote | |
2009-05-11 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-11 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-11 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-11 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-06 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-05 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2009-04-29 | Read first time | |
2009-04-29 | Permission to introduce | |
2009-04-28 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |