TX SB256 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the confidentiality of home address information of certain victims of family violence, sexual assault or abuse, stalking, or trafficking of persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the confidentiality of home address information of certain victims of family violence, sexual assault or abuse, stalking, or trafficking of persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#984 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - Read 2nd time RV#867 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19 Effective immediately
2017-05-19 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-09HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-09SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-08SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-08SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-05HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-28HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-28HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-04-18HouseRead first time
2017-03-30HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-29SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-29SenateRecord vote
2017-03-29SenatePassed
2017-03-29SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-29SenateRecord vote
2017-03-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-29SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-03-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-29SenateAmended
2017-03-29SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-29SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-29SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-29SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-13SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-01-30SenateRead first time
2016-11-29SenateFiled
2016-11-29SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback