TX SB2551 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to liability, payment, and benefits for certain workers' compensation claims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to liability, payment, and benefits for certain workers' compensation claims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1956 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1560 (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective immediately
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1956
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-23HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-23HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-23SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-23SenateSenate requests conference committee
2019-05-23SenateSenate refuses to concur
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1560
2019-05-21HousePassed
2019-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-20HouseAmendment withdrawn 4-Pacheco
2019-05-20HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-05-20HouseAmendment(s) offered 4-Pacheco
2019-05-20HouseAmended 3-P. King
2019-05-20HouseAmended 2-Burrows and Martinez Fischer
2019-05-20HouseAmended 1-Burrows
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-10HousePosting rule suspended
2019-05-09HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-09HouseRead first time
2019-05-07HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-07SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-07SenateRecord vote
2019-05-07SenatePassed
2019-05-07SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-07SenateRecord vote
2019-05-07SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-07SenateCo-author authorized
2019-05-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-02SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-02SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-23SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-04-23SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenatePermission to introduce
2019-04-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB2551
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02551I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02551S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02551E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02551H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02551F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-07-F1.PDF#page=27
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB2551&RcdVtNo=1560&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB2551&RcdVtNo=1956&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=17

Bill Comments

feedback