TX SB2529 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Red River Groundwater Conservation District; providing authority to issue bonds; granting the power of eminent domain.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Red River Groundwater Conservation District; providing authority to issue bonds; granting the power of eminent domain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-26 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Passed | |
2009-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-22 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2009-05-14 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-13 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-12 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-28 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-28 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-28 | Amended | |
2009-04-28 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-28 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-23 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time | |
2009-04-15 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4736 (Similar To) 2009-05-22 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
RED RIVER GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.