TX SB252 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the licensing of certain veterans by the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement and the hiring of those veterans by political subdivisions.
Title
Relating to the licensing of certain veterans by the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement and the hiring of those veterans by political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1845 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-19 | House | Record vote RV#1845 |
2023-05-19 | House | Passed |
2023-05-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-19 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-16 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-05 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2023-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2023-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Intent Calendar |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2022-11-28 | Senate | Filed |
2022-11-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB278 (Similar To) 2023-05-01 - Referred to State Affairs
HB278 (Similar To) 2023-05-01 - Referred to State Affairs
HB1152 (Similar To) 2023-05-08 - Received from the House
HB278 (Similar To) 2023-05-01 - Referred to State Affairs
HB1152 (Similar To) 2023-05-08 - Received from the House
Subjects
Aliens
COMMISSION ON LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Military & Veterans
PEACE OFFICERS
Political Subdivisions
COMMISSION ON LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Military & Veterans
PEACE OFFICERS
Political Subdivisions