TX SB252 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibiting governmental contracts with a company doing business with Iran, Sudan, or a foreign terrorist organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibiting governmental contracts with a company doing business with Iran, Sudan, or a foreign terrorist organization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1097 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-27 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-16HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-15SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-15HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-15SenateRemarks ordered printed
2017-05-15SenateRecord vote
2017-05-15SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-15SenateRead
2017-05-15SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-10SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-08HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-08HouseAmended
2017-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-08HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-01HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-01HouseRead first time
2017-04-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-03SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenatePassed
2017-04-03SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-29SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-29SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-01-30SenateRead first time
2016-11-22SenateFiled
2016-11-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback