TX SB2487 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a prohibition against certain local regulation of employment leave provided by private employers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a prohibition against certain local regulation of employment leave provided by private employers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-16HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-16HouseRead first time
2019-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2019-04-11SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Rodríguez
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-11SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-09SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-27SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-27SenateRead first time
2019-03-27SenatePermission to introduce
2019-03-27SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback