TX SB248 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of and permits for the sale or delivery of cigarettes, tobacco products, and e-cigarettes; requiring permits; imposing fees; providing administrative penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of and permits for the sale or delivery of cigarettes, tobacco products, and e-cigarettes; requiring permits; imposing fees; providing administrative penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-13HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-04-13HouseRead first time
2021-04-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-08SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-08SenateRecord vote
2021-04-08SenatePassed
2021-04-08SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-08SenateRecord vote
2021-04-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-08SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-08SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-06SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29SenateMeeting cancelled
2021-03-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Finance
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-12-17SenateFiled
2020-12-17SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback