TX SB2474 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to changes in the territory, board of directors, and water use fees of the Barton Springs-Edwards Aquifer Conservation District.
Title
Relating to changes in the territory, board of directors, and water use fees of the Barton Springs-Edwards Aquifer Conservation District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Passed | |
2009-04-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-27 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4729 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
BARTON SPRINGS-EDWARDS AQUIFER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Elections
Elections--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Elections
Elections--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.