TX SB244 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Referred to Urban Affairs
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the application of the open meetings law to the board of directors of certain tax reinvestment zones.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the application of the open meetings law to the board of directors of certain tax reinvestment zones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2021-04-07HouseRead first time
2021-04-01HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-03-31SenateReported engrossed
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenatePassed
2021-03-31SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-03-31SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-03-31SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-03-31SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-31SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-30SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-26SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-26SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-12-14SenateFiled
2020-12-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback