TX SB2424 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Postponed 6/1/23 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Postponed 6/1/23 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to illegal entry into this state from Mexico by a person who is not a citizen or legal permanent resident of the United States; creating criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to illegal entry into this state from Mexico by a person who is not a citizen or legal permanent resident of the United States; creating criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
Sen. Angela Paxton [R] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Rep. Cole Hefner [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Postponed 6/1/23 10:00 AM |
2023-05-23 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2023-05-23 | House | Postponed 5/23/23 10:15 PM |
2023-05-23 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1) |
2023-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-23 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2023-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-04-17 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-14 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Passed as amended |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Amended |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Gutierrez |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Amended |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Border Security |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB5270 (Similar To) 2023-03-24 - Referred to State Affairs
HB5281 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Referred to State Affairs
HB5270 (Similar To) 2023-03-24 - Referred to State Affairs
HB5281 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Referred to State Affairs
HB5270 (Similar To) 2023-03-24 - Referred to State Affairs