TX SB241 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain required reports received or prepared by state agencies and other governmental entities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain required reports received or prepared by state agencies and other governmental entities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Passed as amended RV#1669 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1669
2019-05-22HousePassed as amended
2019-05-22HouseAmended 1-Smithee
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-21HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Frank
2019-05-21HouseVote reconsidered
2019-05-21HouseVote reconsidered
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-21HouseAmended 2-Reynolds
2019-05-21HouseAmended 1-Frank, Craddick, and P. King
2019-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-06HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2019-04-12HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-12HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-25SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-25SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2018-12-13SenateFiled
2018-12-13SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1788 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - Left pending in committee

Subjects

ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
AUTISM & PERVASIVE DEVELOPMENTAL DISORDERS, TEXAS COUNCIL ON
CHIROPRACTIC EXAMINERS, TEXAS BOARD OF
COLONIAS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--General
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
PUBLIC UTILITY COUNSEL, OFFICE OF
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE ENERGY CONSERVATION OFFICE
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY--SAN MARCOS
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
VETERANS' LAND BOARD
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS

Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback