TX SB237 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the issuance of a citation for a criminal trespass offense punishable as a Class B misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the issuance of a citation for a criminal trespass offense punishable as a Class B misdemeanor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1287 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Vetoed by the Governor
2021-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-20SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-20SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1287
2021-05-20HousePassed
2021-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-07HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-21HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-04-21HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-12-10SenateFiled
2020-12-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB694 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB237
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00237I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00237S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00237E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00237H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00237F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00237I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00237I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00237H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00237F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB237&RcdVtNo=1287&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2021

Bill Comments

feedback