TX SB2365 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the protection of parental rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the protection of parental rights.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-06SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-05-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-08SenateFiled
2019-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2528 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback