TX SB2332 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to reporting to the legislature by certain river authorities.
Title
Relating to reporting to the legislature by certain river authorities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |