TX SB2314 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the adoption of rules by the Texas Water Development Board regarding supplemental funding resulting from federal economic recovery legislation.
Title
Relating to the adoption of rules by the Texas Water Development Board regarding supplemental funding resulting from federal economic recovery legislation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-06-01 | Senate discharges conferees-reported | |
2009-06-01 | Record vote | |
2009-06-01 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-06-01 | Senate discharges conferees | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2009-05-29 | Read | |
2009-05-29 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-12 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-12 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Passed | |
2009-04-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-15 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-09 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3526 (Similar To) 2009-05-31 - Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
Subjects
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD
Water--Development
Water--General
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD
Water--Development
Water--General