TX SB2297 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a review by the state auditor of certain assessment instruments administered to public school students.
Title
Relating to a review by the state auditor of certain assessment instruments administered to public school students.
Sponsors
Sen. Beverly Powell [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Joan Huffman [R] | Sen. Nathan Johnson [D] |
Sen. Jose Menendez [D] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Sen. Kel Seliger [R] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AUDITOR, STATE
AUDITS & AUDITORS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
AUDITS & AUDITORS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB2297 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02297I.htm |