TX SB2294 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas First Early High School Completion Program and the Texas First Scholarship Program.
Title
Relating to the Texas First Early High School Completion Program and the Texas First Scholarship Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1580 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-27 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-05-27 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-15 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-12 | House | Record vote RV#1580 |
2023-05-12 | House | Passed |
2023-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-12 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-04-25 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-24 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Considered by subcommittee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Considered by subcommittee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4434 (Same As) 2023-05-15 - Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
HB4434 (Same As) 2023-05-15 - Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
HB4434 (Same As) 2023-05-15 - Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General