TX SB2291 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
Pending: House Defense & Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Texas Medal for the Defense of Freedom award.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Texas Medal for the Defense of Freedom award.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2017-05-19HouseRead first time
2017-05-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-17SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenatePassed
2017-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-16SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-11SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-03SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2017-05-03SenateRead first time
2017-05-03SenatePermission to introduce
2017-05-01SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback