TX SB2286 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1361 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-21SenateRead
2019-05-21SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1361
2019-05-14HousePassed
2019-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-10HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-08HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07HousePosting rule suspended
2019-05-06HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-29SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-29SenateRecord vote
2019-04-29SenatePassed
2019-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-29SenateRecord vote
2019-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-29SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-08SenateFiled
2019-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3679 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback