TX SB2272 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Beaumont Municipal Management District No. 1; providing authority to issue bonds and impose assessments, fees, or taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Beaumont Municipal Management District No. 1; providing authority to issue bonds and impose assessments, fees, or taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BEAUMONT MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous