TX SB2270 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to expansion of a pilot program under the foundation school program for funding prekindergarten programs provided by certain school districts with early high school graduation programs.
Title
Relating to expansion of a pilot program under the foundation school program for funding prekindergarten programs provided by certain school districts with early high school graduation programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Amendment withdrawn (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Amendment withdrawn (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-12 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as amended |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
PRESCHOOL & PREKINDERGARTEN
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
PRESCHOOL & PREKINDERGARTEN