TX SB2260 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the grant program distributing money from the transportation infrastructure fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the grant program distributing money from the transportation infrastructure fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-08SenateFiled
2019-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3196 (Same As) 2019-03-13 - Referred to Transportation

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback