TX SB226 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the procedure for action on certain applications for an amendment to a water right.
Title
Relating to the procedure for action on certain applications for an amendment to a water right.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2017-05-18 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-05-18 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2017-05-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-19 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Filed |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |