TX SB2251 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Fort Bend County Municipal Utility District No. 224; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Fort Bend County Municipal Utility District No. 224; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
FORT BEND COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 224
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility