TX SB225 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of Army of Occupation Medal specialty license plates; providing an exemption from a fee.
Title
Relating to the issuance of Army of Occupation Medal specialty license plates; providing an exemption from a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-06 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#962 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 408 |
2019-04-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-12-07 | Senate | Filed |
2018-12-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB408 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
AWARDS, MEDALS, PRIZES
LICENSE PLATES
Military & Veterans
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
LICENSE PLATES
Military & Veterans
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration