TX SB2244 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 1/1/10
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 1/1/10
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of employees of certain businesses or organizations established as part of the state's economic development program and of dependents of those employees to pay resident tuition at public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of employees of certain businesses or organizations established as part of the state's economic development program and of dependents of those employees to pay resident tuition at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 1/1/10 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-26 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-21 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-19 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-13 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-27 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Passed | |
2009-04-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-24 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
RESIDENCY REQUIREMENTS
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
RESIDENCY REQUIREMENTS