TX SB2238 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain sexual offenses and certain other offenses involving conduct of a sexual nature, including the creation of the criminal offenses of sexual coercion, indecent assault, and possession or promotion of lewd visual material depicting a child, and to certain criminal acts committed in relation to those offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain sexual offenses and certain other offenses involving conduct of a sexual nature, including the creation of the criminal offenses of sexual coercion, indecent assault, and possession or promotion of lewd visual material depicting a child, and to certain criminal acts committed in relation to those offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-04SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenatePassed
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-04SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-03SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-27SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-29SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-03-29SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback