TX SB223 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibiting law enforcement departments from contracting with television crews to create reality shows.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibiting law enforcement departments from contracting with television crews to create reality shows.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-12-02SenateFiled
2020-12-02SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB54 (Same As) 2021-05-26 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback