TX SB2222 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain equipment provided for use by the officers of the Texas Highway Patrol.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain equipment provided for use by the officers of the Texas Highway Patrol.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective immediately
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1500
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-26HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-14HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-12HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-11HousePosting rule suspended
2021-05-11HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-05-11HouseRead first time
2021-05-06SenateCo-author authorized
2021-05-05HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-05SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-05SenateRecord vote
2021-05-05SenatePassed
2021-05-05SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-05SenateRecord vote
2021-05-05SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-05-05SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-05SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-05SenateCo-author authorized
2021-05-03SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-28SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-28SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-28SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-21SenateReferred to Finance
2021-04-21SenateRead first time
2021-04-21SenatePermission to introduce
2021-04-20SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB2222
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02222I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02222S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02222E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02222H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02222F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02222I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02222I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02222S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02222S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02222E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02222H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02222F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-05-F1.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB2222&RcdVtNo=1500&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback