TX SB2212 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the duty of a peace officer to request and render aid for an injured person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the duty of a peace officer to request and render aid for an injured person.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-23 - House - Amended RV#1308 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1308
2021-05-23HousePassed as amended
2021-05-23HouseAmended 1-Tinderholt and S. Thompson
2021-05-23HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-23HousePostponed 5/23/21 2:30 PM
2021-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-20HouseAmended 1-S. Thompson
2021-05-20HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-17HousePostponed 5/20/21 10:00 AM
2021-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-28HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-04-28HouseRead first time
2021-04-22HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-22SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-22SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-04-22SenateRecord vote
2021-04-22SenatePassed
2021-04-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-22SenateRecord vote
2021-04-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-22SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-22SenateAmended
2021-04-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
2021-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-22SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-20SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-14SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-04-14SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-04-14SenateRead first time
2021-04-14SenatePermission to introduce
2021-04-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB2212
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02212I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02212S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02212E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02212H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02212F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB02212S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB02212H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB02212H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02212I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02212I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02212E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02212H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02212F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02212F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-22-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB2212&RcdVtNo=1308&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=91

Bill Comments 750

feedback