TX SB2201 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-23 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-23 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Summary
Relating to the joinder of a tax lien transferee in a suit to collect a delinquent ad valorem tax.
Title
Relating to the joinder of a tax lien transferee in a suit to collect a delinquent ad valorem tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1465 (Same As) 2009-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
FORECLOSURES
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection