TX SB22 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain claims for benefits, compensation, or assistance by certain public safety employees and survivors of certain public safety employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain claims for benefits, compensation, or assistance by certain public safety employees and survivors of certain public safety employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1770 (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Amended RV#1269 (Y: 139 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective immediately
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-30SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-30HouseRecord vote RV#1770
2021-05-30HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2021-05-30HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30SenateRecord vote
2021-05-30SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-29HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-29SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-27SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-27SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-27HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-27HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2021-05-25HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-25HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-25HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2021-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2021-05-25SenateRead
2021-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-20SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1269
2021-05-20HousePassed as amended
2021-05-20HouseAmended 2-Patterson
2021-05-20HouseAmended 1-Patterson
2021-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-19HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-05-19HouseAmended 2-C. Turner
2021-05-19HouseAmended 1-Patterson
2021-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-26HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2021-04-26HouseRead first time
2021-04-22HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-21SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-21SenateRecord vote
2021-04-21SenatePassed
2021-04-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-21SenateRecord vote
2021-04-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21SenateAmended
2021-04-21SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Perry
2021-04-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21SenateAmended
2021-04-21SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Springer
2021-04-21SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-21SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08SenateVote reconsidered in committee
2021-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-29SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-11SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-09SenateFiled
2021-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

SB463 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to State Affairs
HB4301 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Business & Industry
SB527 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB22
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00022I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00022S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00022E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00022H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00022F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00022S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00022S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00022H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00022H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00022H31.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00022H32.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00022I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00022I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00022S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00022S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00022E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00022H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00022H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00022F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-21-F.PDF#page=20
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB22&RcdVtNo=1269&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB22&RcdVtNo=1770&Ch=H&Dt=05/30/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-30-F.PDF#page=31

Bill Comments 750

feedback