TX SB2196 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-20 - Referred to Land & Resource Management
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-20 - Referred to Land & Resource Management
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirements for annexation by a municipality of certain municipal utility districts.
Title
Relating to the requirements for annexation by a municipality of certain municipal utility districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2017-05-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Annexation
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
TRAVIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 3
TRAVIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 4
TRAVIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 5
TRAVIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 6
TRAVIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 7
TRAVIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 8
TRAVIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 9
TRAVIS COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 19
City Government--Annexation
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
TRAVIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 3
TRAVIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 4
TRAVIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 5
TRAVIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 6
TRAVIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 7
TRAVIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 8
TRAVIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 9
TRAVIS COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 19