TX SB2195 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the relationship between pharmacists or pharmacies and pharmacy benefit managers or health benefit plan issuers.
Title
Relating to the relationship between pharmacists or pharmacies and pharmacy benefit managers or health benefit plan issuers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Health
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS