TX SB2191 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confinement of a defendant pending trial and detention or placement of a juvenile offender.
Title
Relating to the confinement of a defendant pending trial and detention or placement of a juvenile offender.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-04-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Courts
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Trial
MAGISTRATES
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Courts
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Trial
MAGISTRATES
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice